Global Patent Index - EP 2019953 A1

EP 2019953 A1 2009-02-04 - DOOR FOR A SEPARABLE INTERIOR SPACE

Title (en)

DOOR FOR A SEPARABLE INTERIOR SPACE

Title (de)

TÜR FÜR EINEN ABTRENNBAREN INNENRAUM

Title (fr)

PORTE POUR UN ESPACE INTÉRIEUR SÉPARABLE

Publication

EP 2019953 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06793262 A

Priority

  • EP 2006066058 W
  • DE 202006007722 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE202006007722U1] Refrigerator comprises an integrated freezer compartment having a door body (1) and a handle part (5) having protrusions orientated across a pivoting axle. The first protrusions each support a pin and the second protrusions have an opening into which fit one of the pins for forming the pivoting axle. Preferred Features: The protrusions are formed as wall surfaces. At least one of the wall surfaces is elastically guided in the direction of the pivoting axle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/02 (2006.01); E05C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 5/00 (2013.01); F25D 23/025 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0468 (2013.01); E05C 3/14 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131554A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006007722 U1 20060713; EP 1857756 A2 20071121; EP 1857756 A3 20130403; EP 1857756 B1 20160914; EP 2019953 A1 20090204; PL 1857756 T3 20170228; RU 2007117368 A 20081120; RU 2008147145 A 20100620; RU 2416772 C2 20110420; RU 2424476 C2 20110720; WO 2007131554 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171104

2017-07-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170623

2016-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160518

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS