Global Patent Index - EP 2019957 A1

EP 2019957 A1 2009-02-04 - ALUMINIUM HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN "EGR" SYSTEM

Title (en)

ALUMINIUM HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN "EGR" SYSTEM

Title (de)

ALUMINIUMWÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR EIN AGR-SYSTEM

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR EN ALUMINIUM DESTINE A UN SYSTEME 'EGR'

Publication

EP 2019957 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07728654 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054200 W
  • ES 200601102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007125118A1] The invention relates to an aluminium heat exchanger for an EGR system comprising a casing (11) housing a plurality of pipes (35, 55, 75) for the passage of the gas to be cooled configured inside a body (21, 41, 61) formed by at least two extruded aluminium profiles (23, 25; 43, 45; 63, 65) delimiting said pipes (35, 55, 75) between them, several heads (13, 17) coupled to the inlet pipe of gas from the exhaust manifold and to the gas outlet pipe connected to the intake manifold of the engine, and cooling means including a cooling chamber (19) located between said body (21, 41, 61) and said casing (11).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F02M 26/26 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F28D 7/10 (2013.01); F28D 7/103 (2013.01); F02M 26/11 (2016.02); F28D 21/0003 (2013.01); F28F 9/0219 (2013.01); F28F 21/08 (2013.01); F28F 2255/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007125118A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007125118 A1 20071108; EP 2019957 A1 20090204; ES 2263399 A1 20061201; ES 2263399 B1 20071116

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171103

2014-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BORGWARNER EMISSIONS SYSTEMS SPAIN, S.L.

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYTECH ENSA, S.L.

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS