Global Patent Index - EP 2019966 A2

EP 2019966 A2 2009-02-04 - METHODS OF IDENTIFYING SMALL MOLECULES FOR RENEWAL, SURVIVAL AND MIGRATION OF CARDIAC PROGENITORS

Title (en)

METHODS OF IDENTIFYING SMALL MOLECULES FOR RENEWAL, SURVIVAL AND MIGRATION OF CARDIAC PROGENITORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION KLEINER MOLEKÜLE ZUR ERNEUERUNG, BEWAHRUNG UND VERSCHIEBUNG VON HERZVORLÄUFERZELLEN

Title (fr)

METHODES D'IDENTIFICATION DE PETITES MOLECULES POUR LE RENOUVELLEMENT, LA SURVIE ET LA MIGRATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES CARDIAQUES

Publication

EP 2019966 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794499 A

Priority

  • US 2007010684 W
  • US 79733806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007130487A2] The present invention relates to a small molecule high-throughput screening assay consisting of detectably labeled cardiac progenitor cells. The invention also describes a method of identifying small molecules from the high-throughput assay affecting cardiogenesis and/or modulating cardiac progenitor cell development. Also described are methods of stimulating maturation of cardiac progenitor cells using a GSK-3ß inhibitor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/567 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/0008 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); G01N 33/5073 (2013.01); G01N 33/743 (2013.01); A01K 2217/052 (2013.01); A01K 2217/072 (2013.01); A01K 2217/203 (2013.01); A01K 2217/206 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0375 (2013.01); C12N 2800/30 (2013.01); C12N 2840/203 (2013.01); G01N 2333/723 (2013.01); G01N 2500/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007130487 A2 20071115; WO 2007130487 A3 20080228; AU 2007248622 A1 20071115; CA 2651101 A1 20071115; EP 2019966 A2 20090204; EP 2019966 A4 20100113

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100727

2010-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100315

2010-01-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091211

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/567 20060101AFI20081203BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/53 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/74 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/50 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 5/00 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/00 20060101ALI20091207BHEP

2009-08-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS