Global Patent Index - EP 2019972 A2

EP 2019972 A2 2009-02-04 - 3-D SONAR SYSTEM

Title (en)

3-D SONAR SYSTEM

Title (de)

3D-SONARSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE SONAR 3-D

Publication

EP 2019972 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07776216 A

Priority

  • US 2007010074 W
  • US 79417606 P
  • US 58162606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007127271A2] A 3-dimensional sonar system having a fixed frame of reference including a transmitter and receiver array. The system may include a single ping processor for processing received echoes from a single transmission including methods to match filter sonar sensor data, to optionally compensate for self Doppler, beamform sonar sensor data, to extract bottom targets from beamformed data and to extract in-water targets from the beamformed data. The system may also include a multi ping processor to operate on the outputs of multiple pings from the single ping processor including methods to detect tracks from in-water targets.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/89 (2006.01); G01S 7/52 (2006.01); G01S 7/526 (2006.01); G01S 7/56 (2006.01); G01S 15/66 (2006.01); G01S 15/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 15/025 (2013.01); G01S 7/52003 (2013.01); G01S 7/52004 (2013.01); G01S 7/527 (2013.01); G01S 15/10 (2013.01); G01S 15/42 (2013.01); G01S 15/50 (2013.01); G01S 15/66 (2013.01); G01S 15/8902 (2013.01); G01S 7/539 (2013.01); G01S 13/862 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007127271 A2 20071108; WO 2007127271 A3 20081211; EP 2019972 A2 20090204; EP 2019972 A4 20101201

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130411

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-12-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101104

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 15/89 20060101AFI20081230BHEP

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 15/87 20060101ALI20101028BHEP

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 7/52 20060101ALI20101028BHEP

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 7/526 20060101ALI20101028BHEP

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 7/56 20060101ALI20101028BHEP

2010-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01S 15/66 20060101ALI20101028BHEP

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081030

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS