Global Patent Index - EP 2020026 A2

EP 2020026 A2 2009-02-04 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT HAVING PADS AND INPUT/OUTPUT (I/O) CELLS

Title (en)

INTEGRATED CIRCUIT HAVING PADS AND INPUT/OUTPUT (I/O) CELLS

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG MIT KONTAKTSTELLEN UND EIN-/AUSGABEZELLEN

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ POSSÉDANT DES PLAGES D'INTERCONNEXION ET DES CELLULES D'ENTRÉE/SORTIE (E/S)

Publication

EP 2020026 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07759809 A

Priority

  • US 2007065619 W
  • US 38365606 A
  • US 38365306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136932A2] A pad (20) is electrically connected to a first I/O cell (14) while also physically overlying active circuitry of a second I/O cell (16). Note that although the pad (20) overlies the second I/O cell (16), the pad (20) is not electrically connected to the I/O cell (16). Such a pattern may be replicated in any desired manner so that the I/O cells (e.g. 300-310) may have a finer pitch than the corresponding pads (320-324 and 330-335). In addition, the size of the pads may be increased (e.g. pad 131 may be bigger than pad 130) while the width "c" of the I/O cells (132-135) does not have to be increased. Such a pattern (e.g. 500) may be arranged so that the area required in one or more dimensions may be minimized.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/52 (2006.01); H01L 23/485 (2006.01); H01L 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/0203 (2013.01); H01L 24/05 (2013.01); H01L 24/06 (2013.01); H01L 2224/02166 (2013.01); H01L 2224/04042 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05082 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05083 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05147 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05181 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05552 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05624 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05644 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05647 (2013.01); H01L 2224/06051 (2013.01); H01L 2224/06153 (2013.01); H01L 2224/06159 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48463 (2013.01); H01L 2224/49431 (2013.01); H01L 2924/00014 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01015 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01029 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01047 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01073 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1306 (2013.01); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/05624 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2224/05644 + H01L 2924/00014
  3. H01L 2224/05647 + H01L 2924/00014
  4. H01L 2224/05181 + H01L 2924/00014
  5. H01L 2224/05147 + H01L 2924/00014
  6. H01L 2224/48463 + H01L 2924/00014
  7. H01L 2224/49431 + H01L 2924/00014
  8. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/45099
  9. H01L 2224/05552 + H01L 2924/00012
  10. H01L 2924/1306 + H01L 2924/00
  11. H01L 2224/04042 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136932 A2 20071129; WO 2007136932 A3 20090326; EP 2020026 A2 20090204; EP 2020026 A4 20100609; JP 2009537988 A 20091029; KR 20090025239 A 20090310

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100729

2010-06-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100511

2010-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/52 20060101AFI20090415BHEP

2010-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/485 20060101ALI20100505BHEP

2010-06-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 27/02 20060101ALI20100505BHEP

2010-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2010-03-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRAN, TU-ANH N.

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VO, NHAT D.

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARPENTER, BURTON J.

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HONG, DAE Y.

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLER, JAMES W.

2009-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PHILLIPS, KENDALL D.

2009-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090928

2009-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2009-05-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 23/52 20060101AFI20090415BHEP

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRAN, TU-ANH N.

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VO, NHAT D.

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARPENTER, BURTON J.

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HONG, DAE Y.

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MILLER, JAMES W.

2009-05-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PHILLIPS, KENDALL D.

2009-04-29 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS