Global Patent Index - EP 2020057 A1

EP 2020057 A1 2009-02-04 - ELECTRICAL PLUG WITH FORCE-DECOUPLED SEALING PLATE

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL PLUG WITH FORCE-DECOUPLED SEALING PLATE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER STECKER MIT KRAFTENTKOPPELTER DICHTPLATTE

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC PLAQUE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À COUPLAGE DE FORCES

Publication

EP 2020057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07727031 A

Priority

  • EP 2007052553 W
  • DE 102006022487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131821A1] In an electrical plug (1) with a sealing plate (4), which is arranged between two plug housing parts (2, 3) and has an inner sealing region (6) with through-holes (7, 8) and an outer sealing region (9), which annularly surrounds the inner sealing region (6) and extends radially outwards beyond the plug-in face (5) of the plug (1), the invention provides that the inner sealing region (6) has at least one peripheral lateral surface (11) on the outside and the outer sealing region (9) has at least one peripheral lateral surface (12) on the inside, and that a peripheral lateral surface (15) on the inside is provided as a radial bearing face for the lateral surface (11) on the outside of the sealing plate (4) on one plug housing part and a peripheral lateral surface (16) on the outside is provided as a radial bearing face for the lateral surface (12) on the inside of the sealing plate (4) on one or the other plug housing part.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131821A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022487 A1 20071122; EP 2020057 A1 20090204; EP 2020057 B1 20121031; WO 2007131821 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150319

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2013-11-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007010804

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-12-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007010804

- Effective date: 20121227

2012-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2010-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100614

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS