Global Patent Index - EP 2020103 A2

EP 2020103 A2 2009-02-04 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING POWER SYSTEM INFORMATION THROUGH A RADIO FREQUENCY DEVICE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING POWER SYSTEM INFORMATION THROUGH A RADIO FREQUENCY DEVICE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON STROMSYSTEMINFORMATIONEN ÜBER EINE FUNKFREQUENZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMUNIQUER DES INFORMATIONS DE SYSTÈME ÉLECTRIQUE À TRAVERS UN DISPOSITIF DE RADIOFRÉQUENCE

Publication

EP 2020103 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07811907 A

Priority

  • US 2007069312 W
  • US 80175706 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137205A2] A system for communicating information between a detection device and a wireless device is provided. The system generally includes a detection device adapted to monitor a condition related to a power system. A radio interface unit is in communication with the detection device via a communication member. A wireless device is further provided which is in radio communication with the radio interface unit such that the detection device communicates information to the wireless device through a radio interface unit. The system's components are further adapted to endure harsh conditions (e.g., prolonged exposure to water).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 21/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/18 (2006.01); H04W 52/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/0235 (2013.01); H04M 1/18 (2013.01); H04W 52/0258 (2013.01); Y02D 70/142 (2018.01); Y02D 70/164 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137205 A2 20071129; WO 2007137205 A3 20090409; AU 2007253758 A1 20071129; AU 2007253758 B2 20110120; AU 2010257266 A1 20110113; AU 2010257266 B2 20130131; AU 2010257295 A1 20110113; AU 2010257295 B2 20130117; BR PI0712905 A2 20121009; CA 2654412 A1 20071129; CA 2654412 C 20130423; CA 2773623 A1 20071129; CA 2773623 C 20130709; EP 2020103 A2 20090204; EP 2020103 A4 20131023; MX 2008014705 A 20090210; NZ 572630 A 20110826; NZ 594222 A 20111125; NZ 594224 A 20111125; ZA 200809283 B 20100224

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140521

2013-10-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01R 21/00 20060101AFI20130918BHEP

2013-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 52/02 20090101ALI20130918BHEP

2013-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04M 1/18 20060101ALI20130918BHEP

2010-03-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01R 21/00 20060101AFI20090422BHEP

2009-05-13 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090409

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081122

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS