Global Patent Index - EP 2020116 A2

EP 2020116 A2 2009-02-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIP MESSAGE PRIORITIZATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIP MESSAGE PRIORITIZATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIP-MESSUNGS-PRIORISIERUNG

Title (fr)

MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL D'ATTRIBUTION D'ORDRES DE PRIORITÉ À DES MESSAGES SIP

Publication

EP 2020116 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07775778 A

Priority

  • US 2007009578 W
  • US 41243606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007253412A1] The invention includes a method and apparatus for providing SIP message prioritization between network elements along at least a portion of an end-to-end path between a SIP client and a SIP server. The method includes determining a SIP message prioritization policy and distributing the SIP message prioritization policy toward a prioritizing network element adapted to assign message priority levels to respective received SIP messages using the SIP message prioritization policy, process the received SIP messages according to the respective assigned message priority levels, and transmit the prioritized SIP messages toward at least one network element in a manner for propagating the respective assigned message priority levels to the at least one network element. The prioritizing network elements include SIP network elements and non-SIP network elements.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/5022 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 41/0893 (2013.01); H04L 65/1006 (2013.01); H04L 67/322 (2013.01); H04L 41/5003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007127128A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2007253412 A1 20071101; US 7801129 B2 20100921; CN 101433019 A 20090513; CN 101433019 B 20121219; EP 2020116 A2 20090204; JP 2009535902 A 20091001; JP 5242557 B2 20130724; KR 100973363 B1 20100730; KR 20090005081 A 20090112; US 2010238839 A1 20100923; US 8218543 B2 20120710; WO 2007127128 A2 20071108; WO 2007127128 A3 20080117

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140611

2013-10-02 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20130410

2013-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

2009-09-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2009-08-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090123

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR