Global Patent Index - EP 2020119 A1

EP 2020119 A1 2009-02-04 - METHOD OF TRANSFERRING DATA BETWEEN A TERMINAL AND A CENTRAL UNIT IN A MOBILE DATA ACQUISITION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD OF TRANSFERRING DATA BETWEEN A TERMINAL AND A CENTRAL UNIT IN A MOBILE DATA ACQUISITION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFER VON DATEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ENDGERÄT UND EINER ZENTRALEN EINHEIT IN EINEM MOBILDATENAKQUISITIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT ENTRE UN TERMINAL ET UNE UNITÉ CENTRALE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION DE DONNÉES MOBILES

Publication

EP 2020119 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07730746 A

Priority

  • FI 2007050259 W
  • FI 20060445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128881A1] A method of transferring data between a terminal (Ln) and a central unit (1) in a mobile data acquisition system, which comprises in the central unit and terminals corresponding means and functions (6, 7) for transferring data through one or more mobile telecommunication networks (2, 3) by using several alternative data transfer methods and services (A, B, C, Cl, C2, D), and in which method a terminal (Ln) is activated for data transfer for essentially short data transfer sessions in the purpose of minimizing current consumption, is characterized in that the use of alternative data transfer methods and services during the data transfer sessions is controlled in the terminal (Ln) by individual control data sent to the terminal by the central unit (1), whereby the control is based at least on minimizing the data transfer costs in addition to minimizing current consumption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04W 48/18 (2009.01); H04W 52/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 48/18 (2013.01); H04W 52/0219 (2013.01); Y02D 70/1224 (2018.01); Y02D 70/1242 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007128881 A1 20071115; EP 2020119 A1 20090204; EP 2020119 A4 20101110; FI 118712 B 20080215; FI 20060445 A0 20060509; FI 20060445 A 20071110

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171201

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-01-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111213

2010-11-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101011

2010-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 12/28 20060101AFI20080214BHEP

2010-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 48/18 20090101ALI20101005BHEP

2009-07-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANCOMP INTERNATIONAL OY

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS