Global Patent Index - EP 2020187 A1

EP 2020187 A1 2009-02-04 - Carrying bag containing a separate compartment configured to carry a sports product

Title (en)

Carrying bag containing a separate compartment configured to carry a sports product

Title (de)

Tragetasche mit separatem Fach zum Transport eines Sportartikels

Title (fr)

Cabas contenant un compartiment séparé configuré pour transporter des produits sportifs

Publication

EP 2020187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07113558 A

Priority

EP 07113558 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a carrying bag (1) comprising a first compartment (2) and a second compartment (3), separated from the first compartment (2). At least one of the first compartment (2) and second compartment (3) is configured to receive a sports product and contains an opening (5) arranged for exposing a portion of said product to the outside world. The first compartment (2) is arranged above said second compartment (3) in a carrying position of the carrying bag (1). The invention also relates to a method of manufacturing such a carrying bag (1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/00 (2006.01); A45F 3/04 (2006.01); A63B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 47/00 (2013.01); A45C 11/00 (2013.01); A45F 3/04 (2013.01); A63B 71/0036 (2013.01); A63B 2243/0025 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49826 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020187 A1 20090204; US 2009032418 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090803

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS