Global Patent Index - EP 2020188 A1

EP 2020188 A1 2009-02-04 - Case-like container, in particular for transportable machine tools

Title (en)

Case-like container, in particular for transportable machine tools

Title (de)

Kofferartiger Behälter, insbesondere zur Aufnahme von transportablen Werkzeugmaschinen

Title (fr)

Récipient de type coffre, en particulier pour la réception de machines-outils transportables

Publication

EP 2020188 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07014964 A

Priority

EP 07014964 A

Abstract (en)

The trunk-type container (1) has a main lid (9) with a receiving cavity (21) for accessories, and another lid (23) to close this cavity, or to provide access to it when opened. Ion plan view. when the carrying handle (11) is in the not-in-use position, it is partly surrounded by this handle, and may be shaped for the convenience of stowing the handle in the non-use position.

Abstract (de)

Ein kofferartiger Behälter (1), der insbesondere zur Aufnahme von Werkzeugmaschinen dient, weist ein kasten- oder schalenförmiges Unterteil (2) und einen Behälterdeckel (9) mit einem Traggriff (11) auf, der eine U-artige Gestalt aufweist und zwischen einer am Behälterdeckel (9) aufliegenden Nichtgebrauchsstellung und einer vom Behälterdeckel (9) hochstehenden Tragestellung verschwenkbar ist. Am Behälterdeckel (9) ist ein oben offener Aufnahmeraum (21) für Zubehörteile und/oder andere Teile angeordnet, dem ein Verschlussdeckel (23) zugeordnet ist, der in der Draufsicht in der Nichtgebrauchsstellung des Traggriffs (11) teilweise vom Traggriff (11) umschlossen wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 5/06 (2006.01); A45C 13/26 (2006.01); B25H 3/02 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01); A45C 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/0223 (2013.01); A45C 5/06 (2013.01); A45C 13/02 (2013.01); A45C 13/26 (2013.01); B25H 3/022 (2013.01); A45C 7/0045 (2013.01); A45C 2005/037 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020188 A1 20090204; EP 2020188 B1 20160420; DK 2020188 T3 20160801; ES 2573472 T3 20160608; HU E029034 T2 20170130; PL 2020188 T3 20161031

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2018-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-06-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2018-06-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2018-06-29 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2018-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-05-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2017-01-30 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E029034

2017-01-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007014737

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160822

2016-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160721

2016-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-08-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-08-10 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-08-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2016-08-01 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20160722

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2573472 T3

- Effective date: 20160608

2016-06-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007014737

2016-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2016-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 791365 T

- Effective date: 20160515

2016-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TSWPAT LUZERN AG, CH

2016-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-12-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151112

2015-12-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45C 13/02 20060101ALN20151027BHEP

2015-12-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 21/02 20060101ALI20151027BHEP

2015-12-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45C 5/06 20060101AFI20151027BHEP

2015-12-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25H 3/02 20060101ALI20151027BHEP

2015-12-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45C 13/26 20060101ALI20151027BHEP

2015-10-27 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502007014737

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A45C0013020000

- IPC: A45C0005060000

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090316

2009-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090207

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS