Global Patent Index - EP 2020189 A1

EP 2020189 A1 2009-02-04 - Hot air blower

Title (en)

Hot air blower

Title (de)

Heißluftgebläse

Title (fr)

Soufflante d'air chaud

Publication

EP 2020189 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08013444 A

Priority

JP 2007197644 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a hair dryer that has an electrostatic atomizer, emits charge particulate water, and blows out warm air. The electrostatic atomizer generates the charged particulate water by electrostatically atomizing water, and includes: a discharge electrode (31); a counter electrode (32) opposed to the discharge electrode; a high voltage generation circuit (2) that applies a high voltage across the discharge electrode (31) and the counter electrode (32); and a water supply unit (4) that supplies the water to the discharge electrode (31), the water being electrostatically atomized when supplied to the discharge electrode (31). The high voltage generation circuit (2) is configured by connecting a high-frequency low-impedance element (5) between a primary input terminal (24) receiving an input voltage and a secondary low-voltage output terminal (25b) connected to the counter electrode (32) and paired with a secondary high-voltage output terminal (25a) that outputs the high voltage obtained by stepping up of the input voltage received by the primary input terminal (24) and then applied to the discharge electrode (31).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 20/12 (2013.01); B05B 5/001 (2013.01); B05B 5/0535 (2013.01); B05B 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020189 A1 20090204; CN 101357355 A 20090204; CN 101357355 B 20110323; CN 201244527 Y 20090527; HK 1127316 A1 20110729; JP 2009028432 A 20090212; JP 4518115 B2 20100804; RU 2008131335 A 20100210; RU 2390385 C2 20100527

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130615

2012-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090120

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS