Global Patent Index - EP 2020192 A1

EP 2020192 A1 2009-02-04 - Rotating brush, in particular for fabrics

Title (en)

Rotating brush, in particular for fabrics

Title (de)

Drehbürste insbesondere für Gewebe

Title (fr)

Brosse rotative, en particulier pour des tissus

Publication

EP 2020192 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08425509 A

Priority

IT FI20070181 A

Abstract (en)

A rotating brush, in particular for fabrics, comprises a support body (2) rotatable around an axis (X) and a plurality of bars (3), mounted on the support body (2) in a stable manner and each supporting one or more groups (4) of fringes suitable to perform the brushing of a fabric. The support body (2) presents a plurality of radial expansions (6), which extend from the axis (X) and are mutually spaced along the axis (X), whilst each bar (3) presents a plurality of projections (8), each of which can be stably engaged in a removable manner with one of the radial expansions (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/00 (2006.01); A46B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/005 (2013.01); A46B 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3324496 A 19670613 - HARACZ EDWARD F

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020192 A1 20090204; IT FI20070181 A1 20090201

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-01-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20141209

2014-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 13/00 20060101AFI20141021BHEP

2014-11-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 13/02 20060101ALI20141021BHEP

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090914

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090804

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS