Global Patent Index - EP 2020199 A1

EP 2020199 A1 2009-02-04 - Child bath chair

Title (en)

Child bath chair

Title (de)

Kinderbadestuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise de bain pour enfant

Publication

EP 2020199 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08013329 A

Priority

JP 2007199498 A

Abstract (en)

A child bath chair (1) includes a base member (10) having a seating surface portion, and a back member (50) having a backrest surface portion and detachably attached to the base member (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/127 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020199 A1 20090204; CN 101357046 A 20090204; CN 101357046 B 20120613; JP 2009034207 A 20090219; JP 5140839 B2 20130213; KR 20090013043 A 20090204; TW 200932181 A 20090801; US 2009031490 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120223

2009-10-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APRICA CHILDREN'S PRODUCTS INC.

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090227

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS