Global Patent Index - EP 2020216 A1

EP 2020216 A1 2009-02-04 - Equipped bulkhead for fitting medical transport vehicles, particularly ambulances

Title (en)

Equipped bulkhead for fitting medical transport vehicles, particularly ambulances

Title (de)

Ausgestatteter Schott zum Einpassen medizinischer Transportfahrzeuge, insbesondere Krankenwagen

Title (fr)

Cloison équipée pour fixation de véhicules de transport médical, particulièrement des ambulances

Publication

EP 2020216 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08161389 A

Priority

IT GE20070075 A

Abstract (en)

Equipped bulkhead for fitting medical transport vehicles, particularly ambulances, installed in order to divide the vehicle in two portions, a front portion indented to house the driver and a further passenger and a rear portion intended to house the patient and helping personnel characterized in that said wall is divided in three parts i.e. it has two fixed elements (1, 2) and a passage opening (3) between said two vehicle portions that is said opening (3) serves for the communication between the medical area and the driver's cab.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/00 (2006.01); A61G 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/001 (2013.01); A61G 3/0209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020216 A1 20090204; IT GE20070075 A1 20090201

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS