Global Patent Index - EP 2020217 A1

EP 2020217 A1 2009-02-04 - Operating table

Title (en)

Operating table

Title (de)

Operationstisch

Title (fr)

Table d'opération

Publication

EP 2020217 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07015262 A

Priority

EP 07015262 A

Abstract (en)

The operating table (10) includes a force measurement system to determine the weight of the multi-sectioned upper table (14) above the support column (12), and of a patient on the upper table. The force measurement system can be used to determine the location of the center of gravity of the upper table and the patient on it. The force measurement system comprises a number of sensors which are spaced apart, connected to central measurement electronics.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Operationstisch (10) mit einer Tragsäule (12) und einer auf der Tragsäule (12) gelagerten Tischplatte (14). Um den Operationstisch derart weiterzubilden, dass er eine verbesserte Überwachung eines auf der Tischplatte (14) befindlichen Patienten ermöglicht, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass der Operationstisch (10) ein Kraftmesssystem zur Bestimmung des Gewichtes der Tischplatte (14) und des auf der Tischplatte (14) befindlichen Patienten aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/02 (2006.01); A61G 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/08 (2013.01); A61G 13/10 (2013.01); A61G 7/1057 (2013.01); A61G 13/105 (2013.01); A61G 2203/32 (2013.01); A61G 2203/44 (2013.01); Y10S 177/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020217 A1 20090204; EP 2020217 B1 20110427; CN 101357096 A 20090204; CN 101357096 B 20120704; DE 502007007063 D1 20110609; EP 2020218 A1 20090204; EP 2020218 B1 20120502; HK 1125285 A1 20121214; JP 2009034501 A 20090219; JP 5688873 B2 20150325; US 2009031497 A1 20090205; US 7784126 B2 20100831

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-12-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-01 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502007007063

2016-03-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BERCHTOLD HOLDING GMBH

- Effective date: 20120120

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007007063

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-07-24 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61G 13/08 20060101AFI20130618BHEP

2013-07-24 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61G 13/10 20060101ALI20130618BHEP

2012-04-19 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007007063

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-02-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERCHTOLD HOLDING GMBH

- Effective date: 20120120

2011-06-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007063

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007007063 P 20110609

2011-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUMPF MEDIZIN SYSTEME GMBH.

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS