Global Patent Index - EP 2020218 A1

EP 2020218 A1 2009-02-04 - Method for aligning coupling elements of a patient suspension system and patient suspension system for implementing the method

Title (en)

Method for aligning coupling elements of a patient suspension system and patient suspension system for implementing the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ausrichtung von Koppelelementen eines Patientenlagerungssystems sowie Patientenlagerungssystem zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'alignement d'éléments de couplage d'un système de stockage de patients et système de stockage de patients destiné à l'exécution du procédé

Publication

EP 2020218 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08013830 A

Priority

  • EP 07015262 A
  • EP 08013830 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves connecting a wedge receiver (28) selectively with a coupling wedge (30) arranged on a supporting column (12) or another coupling wedge (64) arranged at a trolley (16), in a positive-fit manner. The wedge (30) is aligned in a direction of the receiver during transfer of a patient positioning top (14) from the trolley to the supporting column. A load applied on a load measuring system integrated in the column is detected by the measuring system during the transfer of the top. The alignment of the wedge (30) relative to the receiver is changed based on the load.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Ausrichtung von Koppelelementen (28, 30, 64) eines Patientenlagerungssystems, wobei an einer Patientenlagerungsplatte (14) erste Koppelelemente (28) angeordnet sind, die wahlweise mit an einer Stützsäule (12) angeordneten zweiten Koppelelementen (30) oder mit an einem Transportwagen (16) angeordneten dritten Koppelelementen (64) formschlüssig verbindbar sind. Um das Verfahren derart weiterzubilden, dass die bei der Übergabe der Patientenlagerungsplatte (14) miteinander zusammenwirkenden Koppelelemente (28, 30) auf einfache Weise zueinander ausgerichtet werden können, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass man mittels eines in die Stützsäule (12) integrierten Kraftmesssystems die während der Übergabe der Patientenlagerungsplatte (14) auf das Kraftmesssystem einwirkenden Kräfte erfasst und die Ausrichtung der zweiten Koppelelemente (30) relativ zu den ersten Koppelelementen (28) in Abhängigkeit von den erfassten Kräften verändert. Außerdem wird ein Patientenlagerungssystem zur Durchführung des Verfahrens vorgeschlagen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/02 (2006.01); A61G 7/10 (2006.01); A61G 1/06 (2006.01); A61G 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/08 (2013.01); A61G 13/10 (2013.01); A61G 7/1057 (2013.01); A61G 13/105 (2013.01); A61G 2203/32 (2013.01); A61G 2203/44 (2013.01); Y10S 177/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020217 A1 20090204; EP 2020217 B1 20110427; CN 101357096 A 20090204; CN 101357096 B 20120704; DE 502007007063 D1 20110609; EP 2020218 A1 20090204; EP 2020218 B1 20120502; HK 1125285 A1 20121214; JP 2009034501 A 20090219; JP 5688873 B2 20150325; US 2009031497 A1 20090205; US 7784126 B2 20100831

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008007101

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2013-05-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008007101

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-07-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008007101

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2011-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUMPF MEDIZIN SYSTEME GMBH + CO. KG

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUMPF MEDIZIN SYSTEME GMBH.

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS