Global Patent Index - EP 2020264 A3

EP 2020264 A3 2009-02-25 - Improvements to trigger sprayers

Title (en)

Improvements to trigger sprayers

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an Spender

Title (fr)

Améliorations portant sur des dispositifs à gachette.

Publication

EP 2020264 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 08252628 A

Priority

GB 0715121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2020264A2] A method of manufacturing a trigger sprayer in which the spray head (2) is supported by the plunger (12) instead of the dip tubes (14) during movement of the spray head to the filling point so that the dip tubes do not become damaged during manufacture. The trigger sprayer may also be provided with a closure mechanism (fig. 9-11) which improves orientation of the spray head with respect to the container.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B05B 11/0029 (2013.01); B05B 15/30 (2018.02); B05B 15/68 (2018.02); B05B 11/3045 (2013.01); B05B 11/3057 (2013.01); B05B 15/652 (2018.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020264 A2 20090204; EP 2020264 A3 20090225; GB 0715121 D0 20070912

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100312

2009-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS