Global Patent Index - EP 2020278 A1

EP 2020278 A1 2009-02-04 - Handle for striking hand tools

Title (en)

Handle for striking hand tools

Title (de)

Griff für Handschlagwerkzeuge

Title (fr)

Poignée pour outils de frappe à main

Publication

EP 2020278 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08300236 A

Priority

FR 0705558 A

Abstract (en)

The handle (10) has a rear part including a rounded shape provided with a double wall (10.7) and an inner deformable chamber (C), after installing a body (11) of a striking hand tool e.g. hammer. An elongated folded bellow shape (10.6) has an end penetrated and anchored in a groove of the tool body, in an inclined position. The shape (10.6) permits the handle to absorb deformations generated by the tool and different ripples of a plastic sleeve, and the end permits the handle to be anchored to the tool body to authorize deformation movement of the shape (10.6), during striking operation.

Abstract (fr)

Cette poignée présente une partie arrière de la poignée présente, à son extrémité, une forme allongée (10.6) de grande longueur destinée à être repliée sur elle-même lors de l'introduction du corps d'outil, et être en contac sur sa longueur repliée avec le corps de l'outil en regard Après mise en place du corps de l'outil, ladite partie arrière de la poignée présente une forme renflée avec une double paroi et une chambre intérieure déformable (C) et en ce que l'extrémité (10.5) de la partie repliée pénètre et est ancrée dans la gorge (11.1) du corps (11) de l'outil dans une position oblique. Lors des opérations de frappe, la poignée absorbe par sa partie repliée en soufflet les déformations générées par la frappe et les différentes ondulations (10.1) et l'ancrage de la poignée par la partie d'extrémité (10.5) autorisent le mouvement de déformation de la partie renflée

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/01 (2006.01); B25G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/01 (2013.01); B25G 1/102 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2720314 A1 19951201 - RACODON SA EXPL ETS [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020278 A1 20090204; EP 2020278 B1 20120201; FR 2919514 A1 20090206; FR 2919514 B1 20091113

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602008013066

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602008013066

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130709

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-02-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008013066

- Effective date: 20121105

2013-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008013066

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS