Global Patent Index - EP 2020280 A2

EP 2020280 A2 2009-02-04 - Covering device of a machine tool

Title (en)

Covering device of a machine tool

Title (de)

Abdeckvorrichtung eines Werkzeuggerätes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de recouvrement d'une machine-outil

Publication

EP 2020280 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104133 A

Priority

DE 102007000415 A

Abstract (en)

The device (11) has a locking device (41) detachably positioning a cover part (22) with respect to another cover part (12). The locking device has a locking unit (46) at one of the cover parts and an anti-locking unit (23) at the other cover part. The locking device has an actuating element (42) rotatably supported at a bearing point, an actuating section and a locking section (44). The locking section is protruded at an angle from the actuating section, and the locking unit is provided at a free end of the locking section.

Abstract (de)

Eine Abdeckvorrichtung eines Werkzeuggerätes, das zumindest ein scheibenförmiges Werkzeug (6) aufweist, weist ein erstes Haubenteil (12) zum bereichsweisen Umgreifen des scheibenförmigen Werkzeuges (6), ein zweites Haubenteil (22), das gegenüber dem ersten Haubenteil (12) an einem Drehpunkt (15) schwenkbar gelagert ist, und einen Arretiermechanismus (41) zum lösbaren Positionieren des zweiten Haubenteils (22) gegenüber dem ersten Haubenteil (12) auf. Der Arretiermechanismus (41) umfasst weist Rastmittel (46) an einem der Haubenteile (12) und mit dem Rastmittel (46) verrastbare Gegenrastmittel (23) an dem anderen Haubenteil (22) auf. Der Arretiermechanismus (41) weist weiter ein an einem Lagerpunkt (45) schwenkbar an einem der Haubenteile (12) gelagertes Betätigungselement (42) mit einem Betätigungsabschnitt (43) und mit einem in einem Winkel davon abragenden Arretierabschnitt (44) auf, wobei das Rastmittel (46) an einem freien Ende des Arretierabschnitts (44) vorgesehen ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 9/02 (2006.01); B24B 55/05 (2006.01); B27G 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 9/02 (2013.01); B24B 55/052 (2013.01); B27G 19/04 (2013.01); Y10T 83/872 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8723 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1777047 A1 20070425 - HILTI AG [LI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020280 A2 20090204; EP 2020280 A3 20111012; DE 102007000415 A1 20090205; US 2009036043 A1 20090205; US 7980924 B2 20110719

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121215

2012-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-10-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-10-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B27B 9/02 20060101AFI20110906BHEP

2011-10-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B24B 55/05 20060101ALI20110906BHEP

2011-10-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B27G 19/04 20060101ALI20110906BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS