Global Patent Index - EP 2020377 A1

EP 2020377 A1 2009-02-04 - Water removal pipe culvert, in particular for a boat

Title (en)

Water removal pipe culvert, in particular for a boat

Title (de)

Speigatt zur Wasserableitung, insbesondere für Boot

Title (fr)

Dalot d'évacuation d'eau, notamment pour bateau

Publication

EP 2020377 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08161277 A

Priority

FR 0756775 A

Abstract (en)

The box culvert (1) has a flexible tube (2) on which sealed and fixation flanges (3, 4) are placed at its ends, where the flanges are fixed and sealed on a hull of a boat and are equipped with an anti-raising water valve and a water deflector. The tube has an external surface with a part threaded and cooperated with an internal thread (6) of coupling sleeves (7) of the flanges. Trim covers (8) are associated to the coupling sleeves of the flanges. A screw thread (5) is formed on an external face of the tube and the internal thread of one coupling sleeve of one flange.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dalot d'évacuation d'eau, notamment pour bateau, adapté pour être placé dans un trou de la coque de celui-ci, comportant des moyens en forme de tube (2) à chaque extrémité desquels sont placés des moyens en forme de flasque (3, 4) de fixation et d'étanchéité sur la coque du bateau, est caractérisé en ce que les moyens en forme de tube se présentent sous la forme d'un tube flexible dont au moins la paroi externe est filetée (en 5) et est adaptée pour coopérer avec un taraudage interne (en 6) de manchons (7) des flasques (3, 4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 13/02 (2013.01); B63B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020377 A1 20090204; FR 2919265 A1 20090130; FR 2919265 B1 20091023

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASTIMO MARINE

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS