Global Patent Index - EP 2020384 A2

EP 2020384 A2 2009-02-04 - Container with an improved cap

Title (en)

Container with an improved cap

Title (de)

Behälter mit verbessertem Deckel

Title (fr)

Récipient doté d'un couvercle amélioré

Publication

EP 2020384 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08161767 A

Priority

IT BO20070559 A

Abstract (en)

A container (2) fitted with a cap (1). The cap (1) has a component (3) having an annular cavity (10) defined by a first wall (3a) and a second wall (3b). And the first and second wall (3a) (3b) each have a respective annular shoulder (14) (16) on which an edge (13; 13*; 13**) of a fastening collar (15; 15*; 15**) and an annular shoulder (15c) of the fastening collar (15; 15*; 15**) rest respectively.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/08 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/083 (2013.01); B65D 47/063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020384 A2 20090204; EP 2020384 A3 20090729; IT BO20070559 A1 20090204

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-05-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-07-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 41/08 20060101AFI20081114BHEP

2009-07-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65D 47/06 20060101ALI20090619BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS