Global Patent Index - EP 2020394 A1

EP 2020394 A1 2009-02-04 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 2020394 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06756593 A

Priority

JP 2006310443 W

Abstract (en)

In an elevator apparatus, a car is suspended by suspension means to be raised/lowered within a hoistway. The suspension means has a suspension body including a plurality of steel wires, and a resinous coating body for coating an outer peripheral portion of the suspension body. A coating abnormality detecting device for detecting damage to the coating body is disposed in close proximity to the suspension means.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/02 (2006.01); B66B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138643A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020394 A1 20090204; EP 2020394 A4 20130220; EP 2020394 B1 20171227; CN 101233066 A 20080730; CN 101233066 B 20130612; JP 5436776 B2 20140305; JP WO2007138643 A1 20091001; KR 100932589 B1 20091217; KR 20080026617 A 20080325; WO 2007138643 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180515

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006054424

2017-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2017-09-20 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170824

2013-02-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 5/02 20060101AFI20130115BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 7/12 20060101ALI20130115BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080116

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU