Global Patent Index - EP 2020396 A1

EP 2020396 A1 2009-02-04 - SPEED GOVERNOR FOR ELEVATOR

Title (en)

SPEED GOVERNOR FOR ELEVATOR

Title (de)

AUFZUGSGESCHWINDIGKEITSREGLER

Title (fr)

LIMITEUR DE RÉGIME POUR ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 2020396 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06756437 A

Priority

JP 2006310131 W

Abstract (en)

There is provided an elevator governor capable of being subjected to recovery work from the outside of a shaft even in the case where a car is positioned in the topmost portion of the shaft. The elevator governor includes a recovery lever which can be displaced between the normal position and the recovery position, and turns a claw to be engaged with the trip lever by being displaced from the normal position to the recovery position; operating means for displacing the recovery lever by remote operation; and rotating means which forcedly rotates a sheave in the same direction as the direction of rotation at the time when the car is operated in the upward direction, whereby the claw is moved to the position of the recovery lever even in the case where the car is stopping.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/04 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020396 A1 20090204; EP 2020396 A4 20131002; JP 4905360 B2 20120328; JP WO2007135725 A1 20090924; WO 2007135725 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140328

2013-10-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 5/00 20060101ALI20130826BHEP

2013-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 5/04 20060101AFI20130826BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080116

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU