Global Patent Index - EP 2020397 A1

EP 2020397 A1 2009-02-04 - Apparatus and system for detecting elevator car overspeed

Title (en)

Apparatus and system for detecting elevator car overspeed

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und System zur Erkennung erhöhter Geschwindigkeit einer Aufzugkabine

Title (fr)

Appareil et système pour détecter la vitesse excessive d'une cabine d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 2020397 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07380228 A

Priority

EP 07380228 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an apparatus and system for detecting overspeed of elevator components such as a car or a counterweight having: a wheel, with an auxiliary surface or auxiliary wheel (100), configured to run on a first surface (210) of a travel rail (200) of the elevator component; an actuating device for actuating a braking mechanism of the elevator component; a speed detection device for generating a synchronized alternating movement with the speed of the elevator component; the speed detection device being configured to not generate the synchronized alternating movement when a predetermined speed of the elevator component is exceeded and to thus activate the actuating device (300). In the system of the invention, the apparatus can be arranged in an upper or lower part of the elevator component. In the first case, the transmission device has a plurality of levers (910); in the second case, it has pinions (920) and chains.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/044 (2013.01); B66B 5/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020397 A1 20090204; EP 2020397 B1 20100623; DE 602007007319 D1 20100805; ES 2348101 T3 20101130

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150804

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602007007319

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100623

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101025

2010-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007007319 P 20100805

2010-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2009-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS