Global Patent Index - EP 2020399 A1

EP 2020399 A1 2009-02-04 - Compact fixing element for elevator ropes

Title (en)

Compact fixing element for elevator ropes

Title (de)

Befestigungselement für ein Aufzugsseil

Title (fr)

Elément de fixation pour un cable d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 2020399 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08380233 A

Priority

ES 200702195 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a compact fixing element for elevator ropes and elevator apparatus incorporating said fixing elements. This compact fixing element for elevator ropes comprises a first body for fixing the end of the rope to be fixed, a second body inserted between the first body and the rope to be secured and pressure means for applying pressure to the elevator rope through the second body. Minimizing the plan projection of the fixing elements for the ropes, preventing the fleet angle or the angle which the rope forms with the vertical plane perpendicular to the rotating shaft of the sheave, is achieved with said fixing element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020399 A1 20090204; ES 2341930 A1 20100629; ES 2341930 B1 20110525

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100220

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091009

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS