Global Patent Index - EP 2020451 A1

EP 2020451 A1 2009-02-04 - Method of manufacturing sheets of steel with high levels of strength and ductility, and sheets produced using same

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing sheets of steel with high levels of strength and ductility, and sheets produced using same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Stahlblechen mit hoher Widerstandsfähigkeit und Duktilität und damit hergestellte Bleche

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de tôles d'acier à hautes caractéristiques de résistance et de ductilité, et tôles ainsi produites

Publication

EP 2020451 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07290908 A

Priority

EP 07290908 A

Abstract (en)

Hot-rolled steel sheet having a strength of greater than 800 MPa, and an elongation at break of greater than 10%, comprises (wt.%): carbon (0.05-0.09); manganese (1-2); aluminum (0.015-0.05); silicon (0.1-0.3); molybdenum (0.1-0.4); sulfur (= 0.01); phosphorus (= 0.025); nitrogen (0.003-0.009); vanadium (0.12-0.22); titanium (= 0.009); niobium (= 0.02); and optionally chromium (= 0.45), where the rest of the composition is constituted of iron and unavoidable impurities resulting from elaboration. Independent claims are included for: (1) a weld assembly done by the steel sheet, where the sheet is welded by beam at high energy density; and (2) a preparation of the hot-rolled steel sheet comprising supplying the steel composition, casting of semi finished product from the steel, subjecting the semi finished product to a temperature of greater than 1150[deg] C, hot-rolling the semi finished product at end temperature of rolling (TFL), where the microstructure of the steel is entirely austenitic to obtain the sheet, then cooling the sheet at a cooling speed (VR) of 75-200[deg] C/second, and coiling the sheet at a winding temperature (Tbob) of 500-600[deg] C.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une tôle d'acier laminée à chaud de résistance supérieure à 800 MPa, d'allongement à rupture supérieur à 10%, dont la composition comprend, les teneurs étant exprimées en poids : 0,050% ‰¤ C ‰¤ 0,090%, 1%‰¤ Mn ‰¤ 2%, 0,015% ‰¤ Al ‰¤ 0,050 %, 0,1%‰¤Si ‰¤ 0,3%, 0,10% ‰¤ Mo ‰¤ 0,40%, S ‰¤ 0,010%, P‰¤ 0,025%, 0,003%‰¤N‰¤0,009%, 0, 12% ‰¤ V ‰¤ 0,22%, Ti‰¤ 0,005%, Nb‰¤ 0,020% et à titre optionnel, Cr‰¤ 0,45%, le reste de la composition étant constitué de fer et d'impuretés inévitables résultant de l'élaboration

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0263 (2013.01); C21D 6/002 (2013.01); C21D 6/005 (2013.01); C21D 6/008 (2013.01); C21D 8/0226 (2013.01); C21D 9/46 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C22C 38/26 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); C23C 2/02 (2013.01); C23C 2/06 (2013.01); C23C 2/12 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12757 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12799 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020451 A1 20090204; AR 067594 A1 20091014; AT 534756 T 20111215; BR PI0814514 A2 20150203; CA 2694069 A1 20090319; CA 2694069 C 20130521; CN 101784688 A 20100721; CN 101784688 B 20111123; EP 2171112 A1 20100407; EP 2171112 B1 20111123; ES 2375429 T3 20120229; JP 2010533791 A 20101028; JP 5298127 B2 20130925; KR 20100037147 A 20100408; KR 20130010030 A 20130124; KR 20140044407 A 20140414; KR 20150123957 A 20151104; KR 20180014843 A 20180209; MA 31525 B1 20100701; RU 2010105699 A 20110827; RU 2451764 C2 20120527; UA 98798 C2 20120625; US 2010221573 A1 20100902; US 2015203932 A1 20150723; US 2018148806 A1 20180531; US 2018163282 A9 20180614; WO 2009034250 A1 20090319; ZA 201000290 B 20101027

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100415

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091009

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Countries: AL

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Countries: BA

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Countries: HR

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Countries: MK

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Countries: RS

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090804

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS