Global Patent Index - EP 2020456 A1

EP 2020456 A1 2009-02-04 - Apparatus and method of producing synthetic yarns

Title (en)

Apparatus and method of producing synthetic yarns

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung synthetischer Garne

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la production de fils synthétiques

Publication

EP 2020456 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07425479 A

Priority

EP 07425479 A

Abstract (en)

In an apparatus (1) for the production of a non-woven fabric of filaments, a plurality of filaments (5) are extruded from at least one spinneret (2), and are cooled in a cooling chamber (4) by at least one flow of air. Advantageously, the cooling chamber (4) is provided with at least one wall (12) opening to make available to the filaments (5) an alternative path that allows the side disposal of the filaments (5) of discarded products during the transitory starting period of the apparatus (1). The filaments laterally diverted are collected in containers or collection areas by means of adjustable draught units.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/88 (2006.01); D01D 5/098 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/02 (2013.01); B65H 54/88 (2013.01); D01D 5/098 (2013.01); B65H 2701/3132 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020456 A1 20090204; EP 2020456 B1 20110615

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007015211

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120316

2011-07-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007015211

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2009-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FARE', ROSALDO

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS