Global Patent Index - EP 2020457 A2

EP 2020457 A2 2009-02-04 - Method and facility for continuous treatment of strips of textile goods

Title (en)

Method and facility for continuous treatment of strips of textile goods

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum kontinuierlichen Behandeln von textilen Warenbahnen

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation destinés au traitement continu de bandes de marchandise textiles

Publication

EP 2020457 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013413 A

Priority

CH 12132007 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves performing heat, cold and/or pressure treatment including multiple direct, successive cycles, on a web of textile fabric, in a treatment system. The treatment system has an air supply nozzle (9), an air suction unit and a calendar roll (15). Thermal energy and/or pressure of the web are adjusted during each cycle. Heating and cooling of the web is adjusted with respect to deformation characteristics of the web during each cycle. Pressure of the web is adjusted with respect to air permeability of the web during each cycle. An independent claim is also included for a system for continuous treatment of a web of textile fabric with air and/or pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Anlage zur kontinuierlichen Behandlung von textilen Warenbahnen sind zwischen parallel nebeneinander angeordneter Transportwalzen (15) Luftzuführdüsen (9) in Düsenkästen (10) eingesetzt. Die Düsenkästen (10) sind mittels zu den Achsen der Walzen (15) parallel liegenden Rollen (23) auf den Peripherien (25) der Walzen (15) abgestützt. Die Düsenkästen (10) lassen sich axial aus der Anlage (1) herausziehen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 15/02 (2006.01); D06C 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/08 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 15/02 (2013.01); D06C 7/00 (2013.01); F26B 13/101 (2013.01); F26B 21/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020457 A2 20090204; EP 2020457 A3 20090415

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-02-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-04-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06C 15/02 20060101AFI20081202BHEP

2009-04-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06C 7/00 20060101ALI20090310BHEP

2009-04-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F26B 13/08 20060101ALI20090310BHEP

2009-04-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F26B 13/10 20060101ALI20090310BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS