Global Patent Index - EP 2020462 A2

EP 2020462 A2 2009-02-04 - Underground engineering apparatus for making trenches in the ground

Title (en)

Underground engineering apparatus for making trenches in the ground

Title (de)

Tiefbauvorrichtung zum Erstellen von Schlitzen im Boden

Title (fr)

Dispositif de travaux souterrains destiné à créer des parois dans le sol

Publication

EP 2020462 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08009953 A

Priority

DE 102007035591 A

Abstract (en)

The control body (1) has a rounded external contour (3). Its shape is curved at right angles to a plane running through the pivotal axis. In order to control the trenching machine it is rested against opposite inner walls of the trench produced. The pivotal axis is at right angles to the direction of driven descent (31), when excavating. The curved external contour (3) is circular and the pivotal axis is eccentric with respect to this contour. The curved contour transitions into a planar resting surface (4), where it is carried on the frame (10) : An independent claim IS INCLUDED FOR the corresponding method of trenching.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Tiefbauvorrichtung zum Erstellen von Schlitzen im Boden, mit einem Rahmen (10), mindestens einer Bodenabtragseinrichtung (21), welche am Rahmen (10) angeordnet ist, und einer Steuereinrichtung zur Steuerung der Tiefbauvorrichtung im Schlitz, wobei die Steuereinrichtung zumindest einen Steuerkörper (1) aufweist, welcher zwischen einer Ruheposition und einer vorgestellten Steuerposition zur Anlage an einer Wand des Schlitzes verstellbar ist. Dabei ist vorgesehen, dass der Steuerkörper in eine erste vorgestellte Steuerposition auf einer ersten Seite des Rahmens oder in eine zweite vorgestellte Steuerposition auf einer zweiten Seite des Rahmens verstellbar ist, welche der ersten Seite des Rahmens gegenüberliegt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2006.01); E02F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2013.01); E02F 3/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102007035591 B3 20081023; CA 2636849 A1 20090130; CA 2636849 C 20120612; EP 2020462 A2 20090204; EP 2020462 A3 20120627; JP 2009062808 A 20090326; JP 4896094 B2 20120314; KR 101142348 B1 20120614; KR 20090013049 A 20090204; US 2009031590 A1 20090205; US 7661209 B2 20100216

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140822

2014-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

2014-05-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140411

2013-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02F 3/20 20060101ALI20120524BHEP

2012-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02D 17/13 20060101AFI20120524BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS