Global Patent Index - EP 2020471 A1

EP 2020471 A1 2009-02-04 - Dry floor system and method for manufacturing a dry floor system

Title (en)

Dry floor system and method for manufacturing a dry floor system

Title (de)

Trockenbodensystem sowie ein Verfahren zur Erstellung eines Trockenbodensystems

Title (fr)

Système de sol sec ainsi qu'un procédé de production d'un système de sol sec

Publication

EP 2020471 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08010936 A

Priority

DE 102007035802 A

Abstract (en)

The dry floor system has floor slabs (3.1-3.9) arranged next to each other in one plane, with at least one floor slab having a groove-like recess in at least one of its side faces. Adjusting means are provided for adjusting the floor slabs and can be inserted in the groove-like recesses, wherein at least one adjusting means is inserted in oppositely-disposed groove-like recesses of adjacent floor slabs. The groove-like recesses extend in the longitudinal direction of the side faces in the floor slabs and have a rectangular cross section. An independent claim is included for a method for constructing a dry floor system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Trockenbodensystem sowie ein Verfahren zur Erstellung eines Trockenbodensystems.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01); E04F 15/02016 (2013.01); E04F 2201/023 (2013.01); E04F 2201/05 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0505 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0511 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0523 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020471 A1 20090204; DE 102007035802 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110510

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100622

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090311

- Countries: AL

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090311

- Countries: BA

2009-10-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090311

- Countries: RS

2009-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS