Global Patent Index - EP 2020472 A2

EP 2020472 A2 2009-02-04 - Wood flooring-multi-layer parquet elements

Title (en)

Wood flooring-multi-layer parquet elements

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Holzboden-Parkettelemente

Title (fr)

Éléments de parquet multicouches de plancher en bois

Publication

EP 2020472 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08160804 A

Priority

CN 200720121910 U

Abstract (en)

A new kind of self-locking system floor is act to be fixed by locking buckle and is composed of a floor having a locking structure and at least a locking buckle. The floor and the locking buckle can be hooked together perfectly, and two pieces of boards of the floor are in a horizontal level after they are fixed together with the locking buckle. This new kind of self-locking system floor is easy to install and remove, even a layman can make DIY.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2013.01); E04F 2015/02116 (2013.01); E04F 2015/02122 (2013.01); E04F 2201/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020472 A2 20090204; EP 2020472 A3 20111130; CN 201125513 Y 20081001

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-27 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120808

2012-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-08-08 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2012-08-08 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-11-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-11-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 15/02 20060101AFI20111026BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS