Global Patent Index - EP 2020517 A2

EP 2020517 A2 2009-02-04 - Coupling assembly

Title (en)

Coupling assembly

Title (de)

Kupplungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de couplage

Publication

EP 2020517 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08160311 A

Priority

DE 102007035517 A

Abstract (en)

The control (90), for the operation of a clutch assembly, reduces the amount of viscous medium in the cooling chamber (34) at least on operating phases where the clutch piston (32) lifts the friction between the friction elements (22,24) until the level in the chamber reaches the required amount. The clutch control is linked to the gearbox control.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kupplungsanordnung mit einem drehfest an einem Antrieb aufgenommenen Kupplungsgehäuse umfasst eine mit viskosem Medium befüllbare, eine Mehrzahl von Reibelementen (27,24) aufnehmende Kühlkammer (34) und eine ebenfalls mit viskosem Medium befüllbare Druckkammer (36), die gegenüber der Kühlkammer zumindest durch einen in Achsrichtung verlagerbaren Kupplungskolben (32) abgetrennt ist. Wenigstens ein erstes Reibelement ist mit dem Kupplungsgehäuse und wenigstens ein zweites Reibelement mit einem Abtriebsorgan drehbar. Die Reibelemente, von denen wenigstens jeweils eines mit Fluidförderflächen zur Erzeugung einer Förderzirkulation versehen ist, sind mittels des Kupplungskolbens für eine Reibwechselwirkung miteinander in Wirkverbindung bringbar. Es ist weiterhin eine die Versorgung von Kühlkammer und Druckkammer mit viskosem Medium beeinflussende Steuerung (90) vorgesehen. Durch die Steuerung ist zumindest bei vorbestimmten Betriebsphasen mit durch den Kupplungskolben (32) aufgehobener Reibwechselwirkung zwischen den Reibelementen (22,24) eine Reduzierung des in der Kühlkammer (34) enthaltenen viskosen Mediums bis zum Erreichen eines vorbestimmten Befüllungsgrades in der Kühlkammer (32) herbei führbar.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 25/0638 (2006.01); F16D 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 25/123 (2013.01); F16D 25/0638 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 10234822 A1 20040219 - ZF SACHS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020517 A2 20090204; EP 2020517 A3 20130619; DE 102007035517 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131220

2014-04-03 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20140226

2014-02-26 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2014-02-26 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F16D 25/0638 20060101AFI20130514BHEP

2013-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F16D 25/12 20060101ALI20130514BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS