Global Patent Index - EP 2020666 A1

EP 2020666 A1 2009-02-04 - Key designs for compact keypad of handheld communication device

Title (en)

Key designs for compact keypad of handheld communication device

Title (de)

Tastengestaltung für eine kompakte Tastatur einer tragbaren Kommunikationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Concepts clé pour clavier compact d'un dispositif de communication portable

Publication

EP 2020666 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07113609 A

Priority

EP 07113609 A

Abstract (en)

A keypad for a mobile device having a housing comprises a plurality of keys coupled to the housing. Each of the keys has means for making the selection of smaller key sizes easier for a user. The keys may incorporate a flexible or resilient upper part, or be configured to transform to a larger surface area upon the application of pressure. The keys may be configured to rotate away from a selected key. The keys adjacent a selected key may be configured to lock mechanically or electrically. The keys may have multiple parts that are movable relative to one another. The upper part of the key may include a fluid, with a selection rod positioned inside the upper part to enter the fluid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/705 (2006.01); H01H 13/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/705 (2013.01); H01H 13/84 (2013.01); H01H 2215/002 (2013.01); H01H 2217/00 (2013.01); H01H 2217/004 (2013.01); H01H 2217/008 (2013.01); H01H 2217/012 (2013.01); H01H 2217/022 (2013.01); H01H 2217/026 (2013.01); H01H 2217/046 (2013.01); H01H 2221/038 (2013.01); H01H 2221/042 (2013.01); H01H 2221/044 (2013.01); H01H 2221/052 (2013.01); H01H 2221/068 (2013.01); H01H 2221/078 (2013.01); H01H 2221/08 (2013.01); H01H 2221/082 (2013.01); H01H 2239/02 (2013.01); H01H 2239/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020666 A1 20090204; EP 2020666 B1 20131106; CA 2637362 A1 20090201; CA 2637362 C 20131231

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-11-20 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007033619

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-08-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007033619

2014-01-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007033619

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-11-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BLACKBERRY LIMITED

2013-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLACKBERRY LIMITED

2013-06-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LADOUCEUR, NORMAN M.

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TYNESKI, FRANK M.

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRIFFIN, JASON T.

2010-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS