Global Patent Index - EP 2020672 A2

EP 2020672 A2 2009-02-04 - High frequency generator for ion and electron sources

Title (en)

High frequency generator for ion and electron sources

Title (de)

Hochfrequenzgenerator für Ionen- und Elektronenquellen

Title (fr)

Générateur haute fréquence pour sources d'ions et d'électrons

Publication

EP 2020672 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013495 A

Priority

DE 102007036592 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a coupling coil (5) that supplies high frequency energy for performing plasma excitation. A coupling capacitor (22) is electrically coupled with the coil. A high frequency generator (16) i.e. radio frequency generator, is electrically coupled with the coil. The generator with the capacitor forms a resonant circuit e.g. series resonant circuit. The generator has a phase locked loop control device that automatically performs impedance matching of the circuit, so that the circuit is operated by using resonance frequency.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt eine Vorrichtung zur Einkopplung von lonisationsenergie in eine induktiv oder induktiv-kapazitiv angeregte lonen- oder Elektronenquelle. Die erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung umfasst folgende Merkmale: ein Entladungsgefäß (4) für ein zu ionisierendes Gas; eine um das Entladungsgefäß (4) gewickelte Koppelspule (5) zur Einspeisung einer zur Plasma-Anregung notwendigen Hochfrequenz-Energie; einen mit der Koppelspule (5) elektrisch gekoppelten Koppelkondensator (22); einen mit der Koppelspule elektrisch gekoppelten Hochfrequenzgenerator (16). Der Hochfrequenzgenerator (16) bildet zusammen mit dem zumindest einen Koppelkondensator (22) einen Resonanzkreis aus. Ferner weist der Hochfrequenzgenerator (16) eine PLL-Regelungsvorrichtung (34) zur automatischen Impedanzanpassung des Resonanzkreises auf, so dass der Resonanzkreis mit einer Resonanzfrequenz betreibbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 27/16 (2006.01); F03H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 27/16 (2013.01); F03H 1/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19948229 C1 20010503 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020672 A2 20090204; EP 2020672 A3 20101110; DE 102007036592 A1 20090219; DE 102007036592 B4 20140710; RU 2008131500 A 20100210; RU 2461908 C2 20120920; US 2009058303 A1 20090305; US 8294370 B2 20121023

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARIANEGROUP GMBH

2013-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130219

2011-07-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2011-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110423

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS