Global Patent Index - EP 2020700 A1

EP 2020700 A1 2009-02-04 - Pluggable print clamp

Title (en)

Pluggable print clamp

Title (de)

Steckbare Printklemme

Title (fr)

Bloc de jonction enfichable

Publication

EP 2020700 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08010762 A

Priority

DE 102007036295 A

Abstract (en)

The clamp has a ribbon cable (2) whose one section is provided in a contact space (5) and another section is provided in a clamping space (19), where the sections form a contact part and a clamping spring, respectively. A bearing bracket (16) is supported in a housing (1) and connected to a spring tip. A clamping bracket (18) is turned back to the bearing bracket. A clamp support (22) is arranged in the clamping space and angularly extends to the clamping bracket. A conductor (33) is arranged in a receiving space against the clamp support.

Abstract (de)

Die steckbare Printklemme weist einen Steckanschluß (6) mit einer in einen Kontaktraum (5) mündenden Stiftführung (8) und einen Leiterführungskanal (24) mit Leiteranschlußöffnung (25) auf, der in einen zentralen Klemmraum (19) im Klemmengehäuse übergeht. Zur Richtung der Stiftführung (8) ist der Leiterführungskanal (24) geneigt. Im Gehäuse (1) ist ein Kontaktstück (3) mit einem Kontaktteil (4) für den Kontaktstift (7) im Kontaktraum (5) und mit einer Klemmfeder (15)für den Leiter (33) im Klemmraum (19) angeordnet. Zwecks einfacherer Herstellung sind das Kontaktstück (3) und die Klemmfeder (15) miteinander einteilig und bestehen aus einem länglichen, ausschließlich quer zu seiner Längserstreckung gebogenen Flachband (2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 12/57 (2011.01); H01R 12/58 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4836 (2013.01); H01R 12/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020700 A1 20090204; CN 101359781 A 20090204; CN 101359781 B 20120215; DE 102007036295 A1 20090205; DE 102007036295 B4 20091008; JP 2009038029 A 20090219; JP 5059710 B2 20121031; US 2009035998 A1 20090205; US 7762834 B2 20100727

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160322

2012-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120413

2009-10-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS