Global Patent Index - EP 2020717 A2

EP 2020717 A2 2009-02-04 - Method to individually set respective heat values of a plurality of electrode pairs

Title (en)

Method to individually set respective heat values of a plurality of electrode pairs

Title (de)

Verfahren zum individuellen Festlegen von entsprechenden Temperaturwerten von einer Mehrzahl von Elektrodenparen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour définir individuellement les valeurs de chaleur respectives d'une pluralité d'électrodes

Publication

EP 2020717 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07021930 A

Priority

JP 2007200420 A

Abstract (en)

A multipoint ignition device comprises: a head gasket (1) interposed between a cylinder head and a cylinder block of an engine, having an opening (3) in a position corresponding to a cylinder opening portion; and a plurality of intermediate members (6) connected respectively to a plurality of electrode pairs (2) and held in the head gasket (1). Respective heat values of the plurality of electrode pairs (2) are set individually by varying the contact area between the plurality of intermediate members (6) and the head gasket (1) according to the respective disposal positions of the plurality of intermediate members (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/46 (2006.01); H01T 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/462 (2013.01); H01T 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2020717 A2 20090204; EP 2020717 A3 20111221; EP 2020717 B1 20130116; CN 101359812 A 20090204; CN 101359812 B 20120530; JP 2009036066 A 20090219; JP 4079989 B1 20080423

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-02-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007028041

- Effective date: 20131017

2013-12-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131017

2013-03-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007028041

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-02-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2013-01-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-08-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2012-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120206

2011-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-12-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2011-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01T 13/46 20060101AFI20111118BHEP

2011-12-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01T 13/16 20060101ALI20111118BHEP

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS