Global Patent Index - EP 2020858 A1

EP 2020858 A1 2009-02-11 - VIRUS SUSCEPTIBILITY BY PLANT NUCLEOSOMES

Title (en)

VIRUS SUSCEPTIBILITY BY PLANT NUCLEOSOMES

Title (de)

SUSCEPTIBILITÄT VON VIREN FÜR PFLANZENNUKLEOSOME

Title (fr)

SENSIBILITÉ DES VIRUS AUX NUCLÉOSOMES VÉGÉTAUX

Publication

EP 2020858 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07748086 A

Priority

  • SE 2007000421 W
  • SE 0601012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007129951A1] ' The present invention relates to the use of a proteinaceous component isolated from plant chromatin, after dissociation of the same, as an antiviral agent. The proteinaceous plant component is produced by means of a method comprising the steps of homogenizing a plant material in order to expose its plant chromatin, dissociating the plant chromatin with a dissociating agent under hydrophobic conditions, and separating the dissociated plant chromatin into individual fractions, one comprising the proteinaceous plant component, by means of a hydrophobic interaction separation procedure. The invention further encompasses a method for treating viral infections in technical as well as pharmaceutical applications.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 65/00 (2009.01); A01N 65/08 (2009.01); A01N 65/20 (2009.01); A01N 65/40 (2009.01); A01N 65/44 (2009.01); A01P 15/00 (2006.01); A23L 3/3472 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 36/899 (2013.01); A01N 65/00 (2013.01); A01N 65/08 (2013.01); A01N 65/20 (2013.01); A01N 65/40 (2013.01); A01N 65/44 (2013.01); A23L 3/3472 (2013.01); A23L 3/3526 (2013.01); A61K 36/31 (2013.01); A61K 36/48 (2013.01); A61K 36/70 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A01N 65/00 + A01N 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007129951 A1 20071115; CA 2651239 A1 20071115; EP 2020858 A1 20090211; EP 2020858 A4 20091230

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100713

2009-12-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091127

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS