Global Patent Index - EP 2020955 A1

EP 2020955 A1 2009-02-11 - IMPROVED ACCESS DELIVERY NEEDLE FOR PERCUTANEOUS VERTEBROPLASTY

Title (en)

IMPROVED ACCESS DELIVERY NEEDLE FOR PERCUTANEOUS VERTEBROPLASTY

Title (de)

ABGABENADEL FÜR PERKUTANE VERTEBROPLASTIE MIT VERBESSERTEM ZUGANG

Title (fr)

AIGUILLE D'ADMINISTRATION À ACCÈS AMÉLIORÉ POUR VERTÉBROPLASTIE PERCUTANÉE

Publication

EP 2020955 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07762087 A

Priority

US 2007068658 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008140519A1] The vertebroplasty needle has two cannulae sharing a common distal end, wherein the cement injection cannula merges into a straight stylet cannula.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/8833 (2013.01); A61B 17/8819 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00424 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008140519 A1 20081120; EP 2020955 A1 20090211; EP 2020955 A4 20110706

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140722

2014-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140311

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-07-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110606

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS