Global Patent Index - EP 2020975 A1

EP 2020975 A1 2009-02-11 - RAMP TO BE PLACED AT A DOOR OPENING OF A VEHICLE

Title (en)

RAMP TO BE PLACED AT A DOOR OPENING OF A VEHICLE

Title (de)

RAMPE ZUR ANORDNUNG AN EINER TÜRÖFFNUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

RAMPE À PLACER SUR UNE OUVERTURE DE PORTE D'UN VÉHICULE

Publication

EP 2020975 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724664 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003736 W
  • DE 102006025278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006025278B3] The ramp for locating at a door opening of a vehicle has a movement coupling via a pull cable (32) provided between a closing flap (30) and ramp body (11) , and this is connected at one end to the flap and at the other end to a guide slide (40) which is movably mounted in the ramp housing (20). The guide slide interacts with a corresponding guiding region (16) of the ramp body in such a way that the pull cable during retraction and extension of the ramp body is moved only over a length section which is sufficient for displacement of the flap.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/061 (2013.01); A61G 3/067 (2016.11); B60P 1/431 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137663A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025278 B3 20070809; EP 2020975 A1 20090211; WO 2007137663 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110927

2011-06-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100917

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEPHANY, FREDI

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081103

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS