Global Patent Index - EP 2020979 A1

EP 2020979 A1 2009-02-11 - Slimming device that operates by improving cutaneous curculation

Title (en)

Slimming device that operates by improving cutaneous curculation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schlankmachen durch Verbesserung der Hautdurchblutung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'amincissement par amélioration de l'irrigation cutanée

Publication

EP 2020979 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07718458 A

Priority

  • AT 2007000247 W
  • AT 9552006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137313A1] The invention relates to a slimming device that operates by improving cutaneous circulation during activity in the fat burning pulse range carried out on endurance training equipment. Said device comprises a main body (1) with a fastening element in the form of a sleeve (2) which has at least two chambers (4, 5) that are independent of one another and that can be supplied with a fluid independently of one another. The device can be applied to different body parts and comprises a belt (1) which is designed with at least two separate chambers, at least one pump (16) for producing the alternating pressure load and a fastening sleeve (2) which press the main body (1) onto the human body in order to start the operation of the pressure chamber.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 99/00 (2013.01); A61H 9/0078 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0107 (2013.01); A61H 2205/083 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61H 9/005 + A61H 2205/06

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137313 A1 20071206; AT 498385 T 20110315; AT 503545 A4 20071115; AT 503545 B1 20071115; DE 202007018883 U1 20090924; DE 502007006502 D1 20110331; DK 2020979 T3 20110606; EP 2020979 A1 20090211; EP 2020979 B1 20110216; ES 2363709 T3 20110812; US 2010210981 A1 20100819; US 2013226043 A1 20130829; US 9408775 B2 20160809

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AIRPRESSURE BODYFORMING GMBH

- Effective date: 20160707

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: AIRPRESSURE BODYFORMING GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 498385 T

- Effective date: 20150128

2014-05-07 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140425

2014-05-07 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140425

2014-04-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140327 AND 20140402

2014-04-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRPRESSURE BODYFORMING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH, SPITTAL, AT

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER SCHOBER SEIDEL PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AIRPRESSURE BODYFORMING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH, AT

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131204

2014-02-05 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20110401133

- Effective date: 20131204

2013-10-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2013-07-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110524

2012-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH, AT

- Document: AT 498385 T

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-03-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Effective date: 20111117

2012-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111117

2011-12-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-12-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-11-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-11-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-11-30 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-10-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110929 AND 20111005

2011-09-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WERNER HOFMANN, SALZBURG, AT

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRPRESSURE BODYFORMING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HOFMANN, WERNER, SALZBURG, AT

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER SCHOBER SEIDEL PATENTANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-08-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110516

2011-08-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2011-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH

- Free text: HOFMANN, WERNER#UFERSTRASSE 30C#5026 SALZBURG (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH#NEUER PLATZ 5#9800 SPITTAL/DRAU (AT)

2011-08-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2363709 T3

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Representative's name: FLUEGEL PREISSNER KASTEL SCHOBER, DE

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-07-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-07-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABC-ONE PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBS GMBH

2011-07-27 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: HOFMANN, WERNER

2011-07-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110216

2011-07-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110401133

- Effective date: 20110614

2011-07-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-06-06 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2011-05-25 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-03-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007006502

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007006502 P 20110331

2011-03-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SLIMMING DEVICE THAT OPERATES BY IMPROVING CUTANEOUS CURCULATION

2010-07-07 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20100604

2010-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100215

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS