Global Patent Index - EP 2021000 A2

EP 2021000 A2 2009-02-11 - NEUROGENESIS BY MODULATING ANGIOTENSIN

Title (en)

NEUROGENESIS BY MODULATING ANGIOTENSIN

Title (de)

NEUROGENESE MITTELS ANGIOTENSIN-MODULATION

Title (fr)

NEUROGENÈSE PAR MODULATION DE L'ANGIOTENSINE

Publication

EP 2021000 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783549 A

Priority

  • US 2007068609 W
  • US 74685906 P
  • US 80759406 P
  • US 55166706 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134136A2] The instant disclosure describes methods for treating diseases and conditions of the central and peripheral nervous system by stimulating or increasing neurogenesis. The invention includes compositions and methods based on modulating angiotensin activity to stimulate or activate the formation of new nerve cells.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/197 (2006.01); A61K 31/4015 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/416 (2006.01); A61K 31/4166 (2006.01); A61K 31/4178 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/197 (2013.01); A61K 31/4178 (2013.01); A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61K 31/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134136A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134136 A2 20071122; WO 2007134136 A3 20080828; AU 2007249399 A1 20071122; CA 2651813 A1 20071122; EP 2021000 A2 20090211; EP 2377531 A2 20111019; EP 2382975 A2 20111102; EP 2382975 A3 20120229; JP 2009536669 A 20091015

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-05-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAINCELLS, INC.

2011-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARLOW, CARROLEE

2011-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARTER, TODD, A.

2011-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TREUNER, KAI

2011-05-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LORRAIN, KYM, I.

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS