Global Patent Index - EP 2021130 A1

EP 2021130 A1 2009-02-11 - FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER AND DISPENSER COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER AND DISPENSER COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

SPENDERELEMENT FÜR EIN FLÜSSIGPRODUKT UND SPENDER DAMIT

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE ET DISTRIBUTEUR COMPRENANT UN TEL ORGANE DE DISTRIBUTION

Publication

EP 2021130 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07765989 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051206 W
  • FR 0651621 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128935A1] The invention concerns a fluid product dispensing member (1) designed to be associated with a fluid product container (2) to form a fluid product dispenser, said member (1) comprising a body (11) designed to be mounted fixedly on a mounting component (3), the body (11) defining a housing (13) for receiving another component (13) of the dispensing member (13). The invention is characterized in that the housing (113) comprises a mobile portion (115) mobile from an initial configuration, wherein the housing is open, to a final configuration, wherein the housing is closed on the component (13), when the dispensing member (1) is mounted in the mounting component (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0033 (2013.01); B05B 11/3028 (2013.01); B05B 11/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128935A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2900643 A1 20071109; FR 2900643 B1 20081010; BR PI0707232 A2 20110426; CN 101421048 A 20090429; CN 101421048 B 20120222; EP 2021130 A1 20090211; EP 2021130 B1 20130717; ES 2429908 T3 20131118; US 2009065531 A1 20090312; US 8118195 B2 20120221; WO 2007128935 A1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007031718

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-07-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007031718

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140422

2013-11-18 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2429908 T3

- Effective date: 20131118

2013-09-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007031718

- Effective date: 20130912

2013-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2013-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

2011-08-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110722

2009-05-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS