Global Patent Index - EP 2021151 A1

EP 2021151 A1 2009-02-11 - CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

SPANNVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE

Publication

EP 2021151 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722441 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000893 W
  • DE 102006022950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131499A1] The invention relates to a clamping device comprising a top part (1) provided with an adjusting mechanism for a clamping arm that can be pivoted into a clamping position and an opening position on the top part (1), and a housing (7) carrying the top part (1) and comprising an inner region for receiving a linearly mobile adjusting rod which is connected to the adjusting mechanism (3) and to a drive arranged in the housing (7). According to the invention, the housing (7) is embodied as an extruded hollow profiled element (8), the inner region having a uniform inner cross-section over the entire length thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/064 (2013.01); B25B 5/06 (2013.01); B25B 5/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131499A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022950 A1 20071122; BR PI0711030 A2 20110531; CN 101472710 A 20090701; DE 112007001674 A5 20090416; EP 2021151 A1 20090211; US 2009224455 A1 20090910; US 8162300 B2 20120424; WO 2007131499 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130416

2012-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 5/06 20060101ALI20121113BHEP

2012-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 5/12 20060101AFI20121113BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2011-08-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110801

2009-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS