Global Patent Index - EP 2021160 A1

EP 2021160 A1 2009-02-11 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A FLUID DAMPER, A FLUID DAMPER AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A FLUID DAMPER, A FLUID DAMPER AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLUIDDÄMPFERS, FLUIDDÄMPFER UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN AMORTISSEUR A FLUIDE, AMORTISSEUR A FLUIDE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 2021160 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07700649 A

Priority

  • IB 2007050201 W
  • EP 06100929 A
  • EP 07700649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007085994A1] The invention relates to a method of manufacturing a fluid damper (4), which has an undercut portion (22) in a flexible part (8). The method comprises the steps of moulding the flexible part (8) of the damper (4) in a mould, removing the formed flexible part (8) from the mould, and flattening a moulded bulge (21) such that the undercut portion (22) is formed. The fluid damper (4) has an integrated spring function including a progressive spring factor characteristic and can be mounted to an electronic device which operates under vibrational conditions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/00 (2006.01); F16F 9/10 (2006.01); F16F 13/10 (2006.01); G11B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 33/08 (2013.01); B29C 69/004 (2013.01); F16F 13/10 (2013.01); B29C 45/0055 (2013.01); B29C 65/08 (2013.01); B29C 65/48 (2013.01); B29C 66/54 (2013.01); B29C 66/73152 (2013.01); B29C 66/73521 (2013.01); B29K 2021/003 (2013.01); B29K 2023/12 (2013.01); B29K 2027/06 (2013.01); B29K 2055/02 (2013.01); B29K 2069/00 (2013.01); B29K 2077/00 (2013.01); B29K 2309/08 (2013.01); B29L 2031/721 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007085994A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007085994 A1 20070802; EP 2021160 A1 20090211; TW 200734556 A 20070916

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110625

2010-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090507

2009-02-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2009-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2009-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS