Global Patent Index - EP 2021166 A1

EP 2021166 A1 2009-02-11 - PROCESS AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A TUBE-PACK

Title (en)

PROCESS AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A TUBE-PACK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHLAUCHVERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS ET MACHINE PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER UN EMBALLAGE TUBULAIRE

Publication

EP 2021166 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07719232 A

Priority

  • BG 2007000010 W
  • IN 804MU2006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137374A1] The invention relates to manufacture of thin-walled tube-packs. The machine consists of a unit (23) for positioning a pre-fabricated tube head (12) and a mechanism (1) for feeding a strip foil (2) to a fixed mandrel (3) with preset shape, mechanism (4) for bending the foil (2) and unit for pressing and welding (5). An M-step transfer mechanism (7) is in a working seat (8i). The machine has also a shaping unit (9), welding unit (10) and cutting unit (11). The unit (23) for positioning a pre-fabricated tube head (12) is situated at a preceding working seat (8<SUB>m-n</SUB>) (n = 1 to 4). The welding unit (10) is positioned under the working seat (8<SUB>1</SUB>), coaxially to mandrel (3) and (13). A driving mechanism (16) is for the mandrel (13). The cutting unit (11) is situated between the clamps (15) and shaping unit (9). The foil being located between the mandrel (3) and a restructure (18). The gap (20) of the non-closed restructure (18) is intended for providing a contact between the mechanism (5) for pressing and welding and the overlapped ends (6) of the bent foil.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 23/20 (2006.01); B29C 53/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 53/50 (2013.01); B29C 31/002 (2013.01); B29C 53/82 (2013.01); B29C 65/02 (2013.01); B29C 65/18 (2013.01); B29C 65/32 (2013.01); B29C 65/3656 (2013.01); B29C 65/368 (2013.01); B29C 65/7841 (2013.01); B29C 65/7882 (2013.01); B29C 66/1312 (2013.01); B29C 66/4322 (2013.01); B29C 66/49 (2013.01); B29C 66/5344 (2013.01); B29C 66/612 (2013.01); B29C 66/63 (2013.01); B29C 66/72321 (2013.01); B29C 66/83221 (2013.01); B29C 66/836 (2013.01); B29D 23/20 (2013.01); B29C 65/08 (2013.01); B29C 66/0342 (2013.01); B29C 66/1122 (2013.01); B29C 66/1222 (2013.01); B29C 66/1224 (2013.01); B29C 2793/00 (2013.01); B29L 2023/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137374A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137374 A1 20071206; BG 109668 A 20070330; BG 66252 B1 20120928; EP 2021166 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140423

2013-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130214

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MECHATRONICA SC

2012-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINDUSTAN LEVER LIMITED

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS