Global Patent Index - EP 2021180 A1

EP 2021180 A1 2009-02-11 - DEVICE FOR CREATING A PRINTING PLATE AND DEVELOPMENT PROCESS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CREATING A PRINTING PLATE AND DEVELOPMENT PROCESS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERSTELLEN VON DRUCKPLATTEN UND ENTWICKLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA RÉALISATION D'UNE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION

Publication

EP 2021180 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07766096 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051325 W
  • FR 0651933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2901506A1] The device has an applying device (3) applying liquid photopolymer on a support (1) in a photopolymer layer (2) having a preset thickness. A detector (5) e.g. reflection detector, is mounted on a downstream side of the device (3) such that the detector is arranged above a part of the layer. A comparator compares a real thickness of the layer`s part with the preset thickness. An electric signal generator generates a correction signal when the difference between the thicknesses is obtained, where the generator is connected to an adjusting device adjusting the flow of photopolymer. An independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a printing plate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0262 (2013.01); B05C 11/10 (2013.01); B05C 11/1005 (2013.01); B41C 1/05 (2013.01); B41C 1/10 (2013.01); B05B 12/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138218A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901506 A1 20071130; FR 2901506 B1 20110211; CN 101448643 A 20090603; EP 2021180 A1 20090211; EP 2021180 B1 20111130; ES 2376914 T3 20120320; JP 2009538751 A 20091112; JP 5043101 B2 20121010; US 2010233354 A1 20100916; WO 2007138218 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-12-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007019104

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-03-20 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2376914 T3

- Effective date: 20120320

2012-02-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007019104

- Effective date: 20120202

2011-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2011-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS