Global Patent Index - EP 2021220 A1

EP 2021220 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR STARTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE IN A HYBRID DRIVE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STARTING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE IN A HYBRID DRIVE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE IN EINEM HYBRIDANTRIEB

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DEMARRER UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC ENTRAINEMENT HYBRIDE

Publication

EP 2021220 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07727696 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053225 W
  • DE 102006022395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131838A1] The invention relates to a method for starting an internal combustion engine (14) of a hybrid drive (12) comprising at least one electric drive (20). This can be coupled to the internal combustion engine (14) via a first clutch (16) for pulsed starting of the internal combustion engine. A rotational speed change (34, 36) in the at least one electric drive (20), which change occurs during pulsed starting of the internal combustion engine (14), is compensated for by continuous changes (42, 44) in the transmission ratio in a vehicle gearbox (26).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60W 20/00 (2006.01); F02N 99/00 (2010.01); B60K 6/48 (2007.10); B60W 10/06 (2006.01); B60W 10/08 (2006.01); B60W 10/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 20/30 (2013.01); B60K 6/48 (2013.01); B60K 6/547 (2013.01); B60L 11/14 (2013.01); B60L 15/2054 (2013.01); B60W 10/02 (2013.01); B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60W 10/08 (2013.01); B60W 10/10 (2013.01); B60W 10/11 (2013.01); B60W 20/00 (2013.01); B60L 2240/443 (2013.01); B60L 2240/486 (2013.01); B60W 2510/084 (2013.01); B60W 2510/1005 (2013.01); B60Y 2300/50 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6221 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6286 (2013.01); Y02T 10/645 (2013.01); Y02T 10/70 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01); Y02T 10/72 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022395 A1 20071115; DE 102006022395 B4 20150305; CN 101443219 A 20090527; CN 101443219 B 20120808; EP 2021220 A1 20090211; JP 2009536897 A 20091022; KR 101092710 B1 20111209; KR 20090007586 A 20090119; US 2009308673 A1 20091217; WO 2007131838 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151218

2015-12-18 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101015

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS