Global Patent Index - EP 2021230 A1

EP 2021230 A1 2009-02-11 - A DEVICE AT HATCH COVERS

Title (en)

A DEVICE AT HATCH COVERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG AN LUKENDECKELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PANNEAUX DE CALE

Publication

EP 2021230 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07748184 A

Priority

  • SE 2007000520 W
  • SE 0601198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007139474A1] The invention relates to a device (1) at a mechanism in order to effect the operation of displaceably movable hatch covers (3, 4) of ships (2) between a closed (I) and an open (II) position and between an open position (II) and a closed position (I) , respectively, and that comprises actuating means connecting with the respective hatch cover (3, 4). According to the invention, the respective hatch cover (3, 4) is connected to, for instance, a loop- shapedly running, driven pulling rope (6) , as well as that on either side (A, B) of the lateral limiting edge (8, 9 and 10, 11, respectively) of the hatches, there is provided a turnably mounted actuating element (12, 13) , which is detachably inter- connectable with the respective hatch cover (3, 4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007139474 A1 20071206; CN 101081637 A 20071205; CN 101081637 B 20120905; EP 2021230 A1 20090211; EP 2021230 A4 20140514; JP 2009538783 A 20091112; JP 5179481 B2 20130410; KR 101442852 B1 20140922; KR 20090012351 A 20090203; NO 20084465 A 20081118; SE 0601198 L 20071201; SE 532596 C2 20100302

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-01 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150522

2015-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150415

2014-05-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140411

2014-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B63B 19/18 20060101AFI20140407BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS