Global Patent Index - EP 2021285 A2

EP 2021285 A2 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING MAGNETITE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OBTAINING MAGNETITE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON MAGNETIT

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MAGNÉTITE

Publication

EP 2021285 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07728511 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054056 W
  • DE 102006020840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2651956A1] The invention relates to a method for obtaining magnetite using red mud, which is produced by the method used by Bayer for the manufacture of alumini um. The method according to the invention comprises at least the reduction o f haematite and/or goethite to form magnetite using at least one reductant, said reductant containing at least one vegetable oil and/or a fat and/or car bon.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01F 7/06 (2006.01); C01G 49/08 (2006.01); C04B 18/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01F 7/066 (2013.01); C01G 49/08 (2013.01); C04B 18/0409 (2013.01); Y02W 30/91 (2015.05)

Combination set (CPC)

C04B 18/0409 + C04B 20/023

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128695A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006020840 A1 20071115; DE 102006020840 B4 20100812; AU 2007247252 A1 20071115; AU 2007247252 B2 20120705; BR PI0711307 A2 20111206; CA 2651956 A1 20071115; CA 2651956 C 20140211; CN 101437759 A 20090520; EP 2021285 A2 20090211; ME P50208 A 20110210; RU 2008143358 A 20100510; RU 2433956 C2 20111120; US 2009175782 A1 20090709; US 9199856 B2 20151201; WO 2007128695 A2 20071115; WO 2007128695 A3 20080131

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151103

2011-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRSYS GMBH

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090414

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS